Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2417 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R8340 YDB-F
 By: Frullo H.B. No. 2417


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Texas Historical Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 442.002(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The commission is composed of 15 [nine] members
 appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate.
 One member must be a professional archeologist, one must be a
 professional historian, and one must be a professional architect
 who is licensed in this state and has expertise in historic
 preservation and architectural history.  The remaining members must
 represent the general public.  A person is [may] not eligible for
 appointment as [be] a member of the commission if the person or the
 person's spouse:
 (1)  owns or controls, directly or indirectly, more
 than a 10 percent interest in a business entity or other
 organization regulated by the commission or receiving money other
 than grant money from the commission;
 (2)  uses or receives a substantial amount of tangible
 goods, services, or money from the commission, other than
 compensation or reimbursement authorized by law for commission
 membership, attendance, or expenses; or
 (3)  is employed by or participates in the management
 of a business entity or other organization regulated by or
 receiving money other than grant money from the commission.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor shall appoint six additional members to
 the Texas Historical Commission as required by Section 442.002(b),
 Government Code, as amended by this Act. In appointing the
 additional members to the commission, the governor shall appoint:
 (1)  two members, including one professional
 archeologist member, to terms expiring February 1, 2019;
 (2)  two members, including one professional historian
 member, to terms expiring February 1, 2021; and
 (3)  two members, including one licensed architect
 member, to terms expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.