E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3999
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 792
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 792
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|