Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2431 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Deshotel (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2431
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of public state colleges in the Jobs
 and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 134.001(2), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (2)  "Public junior college," [and] "public technical
 institute," and "public state college" have the meanings assigned
 by Section 61.003.
 SECTION 2.  Section 134.004, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.004.  JOBS AND EDUCATION FOR TEXANS (JET) GRANT
 PROGRAM. (a) The commission shall establish and administer the
 Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program to provide grants
 to public junior colleges, public technical institutes, public
 state colleges, and independent school districts described under
 Section 134.007 that apply to the advisory board in the manner
 prescribed by the advisory board. The commission shall award the
 grants on the advice and recommendations of the advisory board.
 (b)  Grants may be awarded under this chapter from the Jobs
 and Education for Texans (JET) fund  to defray the start-up costs
 associated with the development of new career and technical
 education programs at public junior colleges, public technical
 institutes, public state colleges, and independent school
 districts described under Section 134.007 that meet the
 requirements of Section 134.006.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 134.006(a), (c), and (d), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may award a grant for the development of
 new career and technical education courses or programs at public
 junior colleges, public technical institutes, public state
 colleges, and independent school districts.
 (c)  In awarding a grant under this section, the commission
 shall primarily consider the potential economic returns to the
 state from the development of the career and technical education
 course or program.  The commission may also consider whether the
 course or program:
 (1)  is part of a new, emerging industry or high-demand
 occupation;
 (2)  offers new or expanded dual credit career and
 technical educational opportunities in public high schools; or
 (3)  is provided in cooperation with other public
 junior colleges, [or] public technical institutes, or public state
 colleges across existing service areas.
 (d)  To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
 public junior college, public technical institute, public state
 college, or independent school district described under Section
 134.007 must provide matching funds in accordance with rules
 adopted under Section 134.008. The matching funds may be obtained
 from any source available to the public junior college, public
 technical institute, public state college, or independent school
 district, including industry consortia, community or foundation
 grants, individual contributions, and local governmental agency
 operating funds.
 SECTION 4.  Section 134.007, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.007.  GRANTS AWARDED TO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL
 DISTRICT. The commission may award a grant to an independent school
 district under this chapter if the district has entered into a
 partnership with a public junior college, [or] public technical
 institute, or public state college for the purpose of:
 (1)  promoting career and technical education to the
 district's students; or
 (2)  offering dual credit courses to the district's
 students.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *