1 | | - | By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 2443 |
---|
2 | | - | (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) |
---|
3 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017; |
---|
4 | | - | May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
5 | | - | Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2017, reported favorably |
---|
6 | | - | by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to |
---|
7 | | - | printer.) |
---|
8 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2443 |
---|
12 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 5 | | relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas |
---|
14 | 6 | | Workforce Commission. |
---|
15 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 61.051(d), Labor Code, is amended to |
---|
17 | 9 | | read as follows: |
---|
18 | 10 | | (d) The employee may file the wage claim: |
---|
19 | 11 | | (1) in person at an office of the commission; |
---|
20 | 12 | | (2) by mailing the claim to an address designated by |
---|
21 | 13 | | the commission; |
---|
22 | 14 | | (3) by faxing the claim to a fax number designated by |
---|
23 | 15 | | the commission; [or] |
---|
24 | 16 | | (4) electronically in a manner designated by the |
---|
25 | 17 | | commission by rule; or |
---|
26 | 18 | | (5) by any other means adopted by the commission by |
---|
27 | 19 | | rule. |
---|
28 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas |
---|
29 | 21 | | Workforce Commission shall adopt rules for the administration of |
---|
30 | 22 | | Section 61.051(d), Labor Code, as amended by this Act. |
---|
31 | 23 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
32 | 24 | | to a wage claim that is filed with the Texas Workforce Commission on |
---|
33 | 25 | | or after January 1, 2018. A wage claim filed before that date is |
---|
34 | 26 | | governed by the law in effect on the date that the claim was filed, |
---|
35 | 27 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
36 | 28 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
37 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 29 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 30 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 31 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2443 was passed by the House on May 9, |
---|
| 32 | + | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 33 | + | voting. |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 36 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2443 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 37 | + | 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 40 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Date |
---|
| 42 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Governor |
---|