Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2443 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 2443
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic submission of a wage claim to the Texas
 Workforce Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.051(d), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The employee may file the wage claim:
 (1)  in person at an office of the commission;
 (2)  by mailing the claim to an address designated by
 the commission;
 (3)  by faxing the claim to a fax number designated by
 the commission; [or]
 (4)  electronically in a manner designated by the
 commission by rule; or
 (5)  by any other means adopted by the commission by
 rule.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
 Workforce Commission shall adopt rules for the administration of
 Section 61.051(d), Labor Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a wage claim that is filed with the Texas Workforce Commission on
 or after January 1, 2018. A wage claim filed before that date is
 governed by the law in effect on the date that the claim was filed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *