Senate | 05/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#747 | Journal Page: 2534 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |