Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2465 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 2465
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to political contributions by corporations and labor
 organizations to certain political committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 253, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 253.105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 253.105.  CONTRIBUTIONS TO DIRECT EXPENDITURE ONLY
 COMMITTEES. A corporation or labor organization may make a
 political contribution from its own property to a political
 committee that:
 (1)  is not established or controlled by a candidate or
 an officeholder;
 (2)  makes or intends to make direct campaign
 expenditures;
 (3)  does not make or intend to make political
 contributions to:
 (A)  a candidate;
 (B)  an officeholder;
 (C)  a specific-purpose committee established or
 controlled by a candidate or an officeholder; or
 (D)  a political committee that makes or intends
 to make political contributions to a candidate, an officeholder, or
 a specific-purpose committee established or controlled by a
 candidate or an officeholder; and
 (4)  has filed an affidavit with the commission stating
 the committee's intention to operate as described by Subdivisions
 (2) and (3).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *