House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3155 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 831 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 831 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |