E | 06/01/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/01/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5573 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3317 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4804 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4837 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3994 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2021 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1530 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1530 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1230 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#330 | Journal Page: 1721 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 285 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 285 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |