1 | | - | By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 264 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 264 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to public outreach materials to foster awareness of |
---|
12 | 6 | | certain public school curriculum requirements. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Sections 28.015(b) and (c), Education Code, are |
---|
15 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 10 | | (b) The materials developed under this section must: |
---|
17 | 11 | | (1) be available in English, Spanish, and Vietnamese; |
---|
18 | 12 | | (2) be in a form that would allow school districts to |
---|
19 | 13 | | mail the information to students and parents; and |
---|
20 | 14 | | (3) include an explanation of: |
---|
21 | 15 | | (A) the basic career and college readiness |
---|
22 | 16 | | components of each endorsement under Section 28.025(c-1); |
---|
23 | 17 | | (B) the curriculum requirements to gain |
---|
24 | 18 | | automatic college admission under Section 51.803; and |
---|
25 | 19 | | (C) applicable course, graduation plan, and |
---|
26 | 20 | | endorsement requirements for financial aid authorized under Title |
---|
27 | 21 | | 3, including curriculum requirements for: |
---|
28 | 22 | | (i) the TEXAS grant as provided under |
---|
29 | 23 | | Subchapter M, Chapter 56; and |
---|
30 | 24 | | (ii) the Texas Educational Opportunity |
---|
31 | 25 | | Grant Program as provided under Subchapter P, Chapter 56[; and |
---|
32 | 26 | | [(iii) the Texas B-On-time loan program as |
---|
33 | 27 | | provided under Subchapter Q, Chapter 56]. |
---|
34 | 28 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2020 [2018]. |
---|
35 | 29 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
36 | 30 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
37 | 31 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
38 | 32 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
39 | 33 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
40 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 36 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 264 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 37 | + | 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
| 38 | + | voting. |
---|
| 39 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 40 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 41 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 264 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 42 | + | 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 43 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 44 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 45 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 46 | + | Date |
---|
| 47 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | Governor |
---|