Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB264 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 264
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public outreach materials to foster awareness of
 certain public school curriculum requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 28.015(b) and (c), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The materials developed under this section must:
 (1)  be available in English, Spanish, and Vietnamese;
 (2)  be in a form that would allow school districts to
 mail the information to students and parents; and
 (3)  include an explanation of:
 (A)  the basic career and college readiness
 components of each endorsement under Section 28.025(c-1);
 (B)  the curriculum requirements to gain
 automatic college admission under Section 51.803; and
 (C)  applicable course, graduation plan, and
 endorsement requirements for financial aid authorized under Title
 3, including curriculum requirements for:
 (i)  the TEXAS grant as provided under
 Subchapter M, Chapter 56; and
 (ii)  the Texas Educational Opportunity
 Grant Program as provided under Subchapter P, Chapter 56[; and
 [(iii)     the Texas B-On-time loan program as
 provided under Subchapter Q, Chapter 56].
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2020 [2018].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *