E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4824
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|