Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2725 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 2725
 (Senate Sponsor - RodrĂ­guez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the board of directors of a
 stormwater control and recapture planning authority in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 391A.004, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 391A.004.  BOARD OF DIRECTORS.  (a)  The governing body
 of an authority is a board of directors composed of:
 (1)  a representative of the county in which the
 authority is located and each municipality within the territory of
 the authority;
 (2)  a representative of each water utility within the
 territory of the authority not also described by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  a representative of each water district within the
 territory of the authority that has been in operation for at least
 15 years; [and]
 (4)  a member appointed by each member of the state
 legislature whose legislative district is wholly or partly in the
 territory of the authority; and
 (5)  a representative of the Texas Department of
 Transportation appointed by the Texas Transportation Commission.
 (b)  A person may not serve as a director if the person holds
 another public office.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *