Senate | 05/24/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 3055 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2573 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2447 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2264 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 2264 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2095 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#536 | Journal Page: 2094 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2094 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2094 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2039 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2039 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amended | 1-Hinojosa | Journal Page: 2038 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2038 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |