Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2750 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2750
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 18, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 21, 2017, rereferred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring a public employer to give notice to new
 employees of the ability of certain employees to participate in the
 Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 6, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 620 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 620. NOTICE OF PUBLIC SERVICE LOAN FORGIVENESS PROGRAM
 Sec. 620.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "public
 employer" means:
 (1)  a county, a municipality, or another political
 subdivision of this state, including a school district; or
 (2)  a board, a commission, an office, a department, or
 another agency in the executive, judicial, or legislative branch of
 state government, including an institution of higher education.
 Sec. 620.002.  NOTICE OF PUBLIC SERVICE LOAN FORGIVENESS
 PROGRAM. Not later than the 30th day after the date on which an
 employee begins employment with a public employer, the employer
 shall provide written notice to the employee of the ability of
 eligible employees of the employer to participate in the Public
 Service Loan Forgiveness Program administered by the United States
 Department of Education.  A public employer may deliver a written
 notice under this section to an employee by hand delivery, mail,
 e-mail, or other form of electronic communication commonly used by
 the employer to communicate with employees.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, Chapter 620, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 applies to an employee who begins employment on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 (b)  A public employer, as defined by Section 620.001,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, shall provide the written
 notice described by Section 620.002, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, to an employee employed by the employer on the effective
 date of this Act not later than September 11, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *