1 | 1 | | By: Hinojosa, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2750 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 18, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Commerce; May 21, 2017, rereferred to Committee on |
---|
5 | 5 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by |
---|
6 | 6 | | the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to requiring a public employer to give notice to new |
---|
13 | 13 | | employees of the ability of certain employees to participate in the |
---|
14 | 14 | | Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 6, Government Code, is amended |
---|
17 | 17 | | by adding Chapter 620 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | CHAPTER 620. NOTICE OF PUBLIC SERVICE LOAN FORGIVENESS PROGRAM |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 620.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "public |
---|
20 | 20 | | employer" means: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) a county, a municipality, or another political |
---|
22 | 22 | | subdivision of this state, including a school district; or |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) a board, a commission, an office, a department, or |
---|
24 | 24 | | another agency in the executive, judicial, or legislative branch of |
---|
25 | 25 | | state government, including an institution of higher education. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Sec. 620.002. NOTICE OF PUBLIC SERVICE LOAN FORGIVENESS |
---|
27 | 27 | | PROGRAM. Not later than the 30th day after the date on which an |
---|
28 | 28 | | employee begins employment with a public employer, the employer |
---|
29 | 29 | | shall provide written notice to the employee of the ability of |
---|
30 | 30 | | eligible employees of the employer to participate in the Public |
---|
31 | 31 | | Service Loan Forgiveness Program administered by the United States |
---|
32 | 32 | | Department of Education. A public employer may deliver a written |
---|
33 | 33 | | notice under this section to an employee by hand delivery, mail, |
---|
34 | 34 | | e-mail, or other form of electronic communication commonly used by |
---|
35 | 35 | | the employer to communicate with employees. |
---|
36 | 36 | | SECTION 2. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this |
---|
37 | 37 | | section, Chapter 620, Government Code, as added by this Act, |
---|
38 | 38 | | applies to an employee who begins employment on or after the |
---|
39 | 39 | | effective date of this Act. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) A public employer, as defined by Section 620.001, |
---|
41 | 41 | | Government Code, as added by this Act, shall provide the written |
---|
42 | 42 | | notice described by Section 620.002, Government Code, as added by |
---|
43 | 43 | | this Act, to an employee employed by the employer on the effective |
---|
44 | 44 | | date of this Act not later than September 11, 2017. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
46 | 46 | | * * * * * |
---|