Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#588
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#571
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|