Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3193 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alvarado, King of Parker H.B. No. 3193
 (Senate Sponsor - Lucio)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the relationship between public employers and fire and
 police employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 174.002(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The policy of this state is that a political subdivision
 shall provide its fire fighters and police officers with
 compensation and other conditions of employment that are
 substantially equal to [the same as] compensation and other
 conditions of employment that prevail [prevailing] in comparable
 fire and police departments [private sector employment].
 SECTION 2.  Section 174.021, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 174.021.  COMPENSATION [PREVAILING WAGE] AND WORKING
 CONDITIONS REQUIRED.  A political subdivision that employs fire
 fighters, police officers, or both, shall provide those employees
 with compensation and other conditions of employment that are[:
 [(1)]  substantially equal to compensation and other
 conditions of employment that prevail in comparable fire or police
 departments, as applicable [employment in the private sector; and
 [(2)     based on prevailing private sector compensation
 and conditions of employment in the labor market area in other jobs
 that require the same or similar skills, ability, and training and
 may be performed under the same or similar conditions].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *