Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1575 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Record vote | RV#592 | Journal Page: 2206 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2205 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2205 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Record vote | RV#573 | Journal Page: 2147 |
House | 05/01/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2146 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |