Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3226 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R20635 BEE-F
 By: Phillips H.B. No. 3226
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3226:
 By:  Phillips C.S.H.B. No. 3226


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a temporary health insurance risk pool.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle G, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1510 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1510. TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE RISK POOL
 Sec. 1510.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "pool" means a
 temporary health insurance risk pool that is established and
 administered by the commissioner under this chapter.
 Sec. 1510.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE
 RISK POOL. To the extent that federal funds become available under
 federal law, regulation, or executive action after March 1, 2017,
 the commissioner may:
 (1)  apply for such funds; and
 (2)  use such funds to establish and administer a
 temporary health insurance risk pool for the purposes of this
 chapter.
 Sec. 1510.003.  PURPOSE OF POOL. (a) The exclusive purpose
 of the pool is to provide a temporary mechanism for maximizing
 available federal funding to assist residents of this state in
 obtaining access to quality health care at minimum cost to the
 public.
 (b)  The pool may not be used to expand the Medicaid program,
 including the program administered under Chapter 32, Human
 Resources Code, and the program administered under Chapter 533,
 Government Code.
 Sec. 1510.004.  PROVISION OF COVERAGE. Subject to any
 requirements for obtaining federal funds held in the pool, the
 commissioner may use pool funds:
 (1)  to provide alternative individual health
 insurance coverage to eligible individuals that does not diminish
 the availability of traditional commercial health care coverage;
 (2)  to provide funding to individual health benefit
 plan issuers that cover individuals with certain health or cost
 characteristics in exchange for lower enrollee premium rates; or
 (3)  to provide a reinsurance program for health
 benefit plan issuers in the individual market in exchange for lower
 enrollee premium rates.
 Sec. 1510.005.  CONTRACTS AND AGREEMENTS. (a) The
 commissioner may enter into a contract or agreement that the
 commissioner determines is appropriate to carry out this chapter,
 including a contract or agreement with:
 (1)  a similar pool in another state for the joint
 performance of common administrative functions;
 (2)  another organization for the performance of
 administrative functions; or
 (3)  a federal agency.
 (b)  The commissioner may contract for stop-loss insurance
 for risks incurred under this chapter.
 Sec. 1510.006.  FUNDING. (a) The commissioner may use funds
 appropriated to the department to:
 (1)  apply for federal funding and grants; and
 (2)  administer this chapter.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 6(e)(2)(B), Chapter 615 (S.B.
 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, the
 commissioner may use money appropriated to the department from the
 healthy Texas small employer premium stabilization fund for the
 exclusive purposes of this chapter, other than for paying salaries
 and salary-related benefits.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 6(e)(2)(B), Chapter 615 (S.B.
 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, the
 commissioner shall transfer money from the healthy Texas small
 employer premium stabilization fund to the Texas Department of
 Insurance operating account in an amount equal to the amount of
 money appropriated to the department from that fund, as described
 by Subsection (b), for the direct and indirect costs of the
 exclusive purposes of this chapter.
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsections (a) and (b), the
 commissioner may not use any state funds to fund the pool unless the
 funds are specifically appropriated for that purpose.
 (e)  The commissioner may use federal funds to administer
 this chapter, as appropriate.
 Sec. 1510.007.  PUBLIC EDUCATION AND OUTREACH. (a) The
 commissioner may use funds appropriated to the department for the
 exclusive purposes of this chapter to develop and implement public
 education, outreach, and facilitated enrollment strategies under
 this chapter.
 (b)  The commissioner may contract with marketing
 organizations to perform or provide assistance with the strategies
 described by Subsection (a).
 Sec. 1510.008.  WAIVER. (a) The commissioner may apply to
 the United States secretary of health and human services under 42
 U.S.C. Section 18052 for a waiver of applicable provisions of the
 Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148)
 and any applicable regulations or guidance with respect to health
 insurance coverage in this state for a plan year beginning on or
 after January 1, 2017.
 (b)  The commissioner may take any action the commissioner
 considers appropriate to make an application under this section.
 (c)  The commissioner may implement a state plan that meets
 the requirements of a waiver granted in response to an application
 under Subsection (a) if the plan is:
 (1)  consistent with state and federal law; and
 (2)  approved by the United States secretary of health
 and human services.
 Sec. 1510.009.  ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY. In addition to the
 powers granted to the commissioner under this chapter, the
 commissioner may exercise any authority that may be exercised under
 the law of this state by:
 (1)  a reinsurer; or
 (2)  a health benefit plan issuer authorized to write
 health benefit plans in this state.
 Sec. 1510.010.  RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules
 necessary to implement this chapter, including rules to administer
 the pool and distribute money from the pool.
 Sec. 1510.011.  EXEMPTION FROM STATE TAXES AND FEES.
 Notwithstanding any other law, a program created under this chapter
 is not subject to any state tax, regulatory fee, or surcharge,
 including a premium or maintenance tax or fee.
 Sec. 1510.012.  ANNUAL REPORT OF POOL ACTIVITIES. (a)
 Beginning June 1, 2018, not later than June 1 of each year, the
 department shall submit a report to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (b)  The report submitted under Subsection (a) must:
 (1)  summarize the activities conducted under this
 chapter in the calendar year preceding the year in which the report
 is submitted; and
 (2)  include information relating to:
 (A)  net written and earned premiums;
 (B)  plan enrollment;
 (C)  administration expenses; and
 (D)  paid and incurred losses.
 Sec. 1510.013.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
 August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Notwithstanding Section 6(d)(2), Chapter 615
 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013,
 on the effective date of this Act, the commissioner of insurance
 shall transfer any money remaining outside the state treasury in
 the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company account established
 under Section 6(c), Chapter 615 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, to the healthy Texas small
 employer premium stabilization fund.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.