Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3226 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 85R20635 BEE-F
22 By: Phillips H.B. No. 3226
3- Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3226:
4- By: Phillips C.S.H.B. No. 3226
53
64
75 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
86 AN ACT
97 relating to the creation of a temporary health insurance risk pool.
108 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
119 SECTION 1. Subtitle G, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
1210 by adding Chapter 1510 to read as follows:
1311 CHAPTER 1510. TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE RISK POOL
1412 Sec. 1510.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "pool" means a
1513 temporary health insurance risk pool that is established and
1614 administered by the commissioner under this chapter.
1715 Sec. 1510.002. ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE
1816 RISK POOL. To the extent that federal funds become available under
1917 federal law, regulation, or executive action after March 1, 2017,
2018 the commissioner may:
2119 (1) apply for such funds; and
2220 (2) use such funds to establish and administer a
2321 temporary health insurance risk pool for the purposes of this
2422 chapter.
2523 Sec. 1510.003. PURPOSE OF POOL. (a) The exclusive purpose
2624 of the pool is to provide a temporary mechanism for maximizing
2725 available federal funding to assist residents of this state in
2826 obtaining access to quality health care at minimum cost to the
2927 public.
3028 (b) The pool may not be used to expand the Medicaid program,
3129 including the program administered under Chapter 32, Human
3230 Resources Code, and the program administered under Chapter 533,
3331 Government Code.
3432 Sec. 1510.004. PROVISION OF COVERAGE. Subject to any
3533 requirements for obtaining federal funds held in the pool, the
3634 commissioner may use pool funds:
3735 (1) to provide alternative individual health
3836 insurance coverage to eligible individuals that does not diminish
3937 the availability of traditional commercial health care coverage;
4038 (2) to provide funding to individual health benefit
4139 plan issuers that cover individuals with certain health or cost
4240 characteristics in exchange for lower enrollee premium rates; or
4341 (3) to provide a reinsurance program for health
4442 benefit plan issuers in the individual market in exchange for lower
4543 enrollee premium rates.
4644 Sec. 1510.005. CONTRACTS AND AGREEMENTS. (a) The
4745 commissioner may enter into a contract or agreement that the
4846 commissioner determines is appropriate to carry out this chapter,
4947 including a contract or agreement with:
5048 (1) a similar pool in another state for the joint
5149 performance of common administrative functions;
5250 (2) another organization for the performance of
5351 administrative functions; or
5452 (3) a federal agency.
5553 (b) The commissioner may contract for stop-loss insurance
5654 for risks incurred under this chapter.
5755 Sec. 1510.006. FUNDING. (a) The commissioner may use funds
5856 appropriated to the department to:
5957 (1) apply for federal funding and grants; and
6058 (2) administer this chapter.
6159 (b) Notwithstanding Section 6(e)(2)(B), Chapter 615 (S.B.
6260 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, the
6361 commissioner may use money appropriated to the department from the
6462 healthy Texas small employer premium stabilization fund for the
6563 exclusive purposes of this chapter, other than for paying salaries
6664 and salary-related benefits.
6765 (c) Notwithstanding Section 6(e)(2)(B), Chapter 615 (S.B.
6866 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, the
6967 commissioner shall transfer money from the healthy Texas small
7068 employer premium stabilization fund to the Texas Department of
7169 Insurance operating account in an amount equal to the amount of
7270 money appropriated to the department from that fund, as described
7371 by Subsection (b), for the direct and indirect costs of the
7472 exclusive purposes of this chapter.
7573 (d) Except as provided by Subsections (a) and (b), the
7674 commissioner may not use any state funds to fund the pool unless the
7775 funds are specifically appropriated for that purpose.
7876 (e) The commissioner may use federal funds to administer
7977 this chapter, as appropriate.
8078 Sec. 1510.007. PUBLIC EDUCATION AND OUTREACH. (a) The
8179 commissioner may use funds appropriated to the department for the
8280 exclusive purposes of this chapter to develop and implement public
8381 education, outreach, and facilitated enrollment strategies under
8482 this chapter.
8583 (b) The commissioner may contract with marketing
8684 organizations to perform or provide assistance with the strategies
8785 described by Subsection (a).
8886 Sec. 1510.008. WAIVER. (a) The commissioner may apply to
8987 the United States secretary of health and human services under 42
9088 U.S.C. Section 18052 for a waiver of applicable provisions of the
9189 Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148)
9290 and any applicable regulations or guidance with respect to health
9391 insurance coverage in this state for a plan year beginning on or
9492 after January 1, 2017.
9593 (b) The commissioner may take any action the commissioner
9694 considers appropriate to make an application under this section.
9795 (c) The commissioner may implement a state plan that meets
9896 the requirements of a waiver granted in response to an application
9997 under Subsection (a) if the plan is:
10098 (1) consistent with state and federal law; and
10199 (2) approved by the United States secretary of health
102100 and human services.
103101 Sec. 1510.009. ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY. In addition to the
104102 powers granted to the commissioner under this chapter, the
105103 commissioner may exercise any authority that may be exercised under
106104 the law of this state by:
107105 (1) a reinsurer; or
108106 (2) a health benefit plan issuer authorized to write
109107 health benefit plans in this state.
110108 Sec. 1510.010. RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules
111109 necessary to implement this chapter, including rules to administer
112110 the pool and distribute money from the pool.
113111 Sec. 1510.011. EXEMPTION FROM STATE TAXES AND FEES.
114112 Notwithstanding any other law, a program created under this chapter
115113 is not subject to any state tax, regulatory fee, or surcharge,
116114 including a premium or maintenance tax or fee.
117115 Sec. 1510.012. ANNUAL REPORT OF POOL ACTIVITIES. (a)
118116 Beginning June 1, 2018, not later than June 1 of each year, the
119117 department shall submit a report to the governor, the lieutenant
120118 governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives.
121119 (b) The report submitted under Subsection (a) must:
122120 (1) summarize the activities conducted under this
123121 chapter in the calendar year preceding the year in which the report
124122 is submitted; and
125123 (2) include information relating to:
126124 (A) net written and earned premiums;
127125 (B) plan enrollment;
128126 (C) administration expenses; and
129127 (D) paid and incurred losses.
130128 Sec. 1510.013. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
131129 August 31, 2019.
132130 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 6(d)(2), Chapter 615
133131 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013,
134132 on the effective date of this Act, the commissioner of insurance
135133 shall transfer any money remaining outside the state treasury in
136134 the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company account established
137135 under Section 6(c), Chapter 615 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd
138136 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, to the healthy Texas small
139137 employer premium stabilization fund.
140138 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
141139 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
142140 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
143141 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
144142 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.