E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3534
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5335
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1911
|
Journal Page: 5335
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5335
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#117
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#114
|
Journal Page: 900
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
11/16/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|