Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill November 17, 2016

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017