LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB377
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB377
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB377
Compare Versions
HB377 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB377 Engrossed February 2, 2025
HB377 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB377 Enrolled May 29, 2017
HB377 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
HB377 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
HB377 Introduced November 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
HB377 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB377 Engrossed February 2, 2025
HB377 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB377 Enrolled May 29, 2017
HB377 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
HB377 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
HB377 Introduced November 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare