Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3779 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/15/2017

                            By: Martinez H.B. No. 3779


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional
 mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 223.201(i) and (j), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (i)  The authority to enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement expires:
 (1)  August 31, 2021 [2017], for a project described by
 Subsection (f), other than the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway)
 project and the State Highway 183 managed lanes project; and
 (2)  August 31, 2015, for the State Highway 183 managed
 lanes project.
 (j)  Before the department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement under Subsection (f), the department must:
 (1)  for a project other than the State Highway 99
 (Grand Parkway) project, obtain[, not later than August 31, 2017,]
 the appropriate environmental clearance:
 (A)  for the project; or
 (B)  for the initial or base scope of the project
 if the project agreement provides for the phased construction of
 the project; and
 (2)  present to the commission a full financial plan
 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 223.2011(b) and (f), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Before the department or an authority may enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement under this section, the
 department or the authority, as applicable, must:
 (1)  obtain the appropriate environmental clearance:
 (A)  for the project; or
 (B)  for the initial or base scope of the project
 if the project agreement provides for the phased construction of
 the project; and
 (2)  present to the commission a full financial plan
 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals
 [meet the requirements under Section 223.201(j)].
 (f)  The authority to enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement under Subsection (a) [this section] expires August 31,
 2021 [2017].
 SECTION 3.  Sections 223.201(k) and 223.2011(c),
 Transportation Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect August 30, 2017.