Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB635 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 635
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to issuance of a vendor permit for the sale of goods during
 an authorized event held in the Texas mall area of the Capitol
 Complex.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2165.260 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2165.260.  TEXAS MALL AREA VENDOR PERMIT. (a) In this
 section, the "Texas mall area of the Capitol Complex" means the
 state-owned property within the area bounded on the north by Martin
 Luther King, Jr., Boulevard, on the east by Brazos Street, on the
 south by 15th Street, and on the west by Colorado Street.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the State Preservation
 Board by rule and in consultation with the commission and other
 appropriate state agencies shall establish a process for a vendor
 to apply for and obtain from the board a permit that allows the
 vendor to sell goods from a rented space during an event authorized
 by the board and held in the Texas mall area of the Capitol Complex.
 (c)  The State Preservation Board is not required to adopt
 the rules required under Subsection (b) until the Capitol Complex
 master plan developed under Section 2166.105 is implemented and the
 Texas mall proposed in the plan is established.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *