Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill December 16, 2016

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 17, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017