Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#668
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2279
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#613
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
House
|
12/21/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|