Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB714 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wu, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 714
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 2; May 18, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the civil prosecution of offenses involving certain
 municipal parking ordinances; authorizing a civil fine.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 601.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 601.001.  PARKING ON PRIVATE PROPERTY. (a) A
 municipality by ordinance may regulate the parking of motor
 vehicles on private property and may enforce the ordinance in the
 same manner that it enforces ordinances regulating parking in
 public no-parking zones, including the impoundment of offending
 vehicles.
 (b)  As provided by Chapter 682, Transportation Code, a
 municipality with a population of 1.9 million or more may:
 (1)  declare the violation of a municipal ordinance
 relating to the parking of an unattended motor vehicle in the front
 or side yard of a single-family residence in a residential area to
 be a civil offense; and
 (2)  by ordinance establish an administrative
 adjudication hearing procedure under which a civil fine may be
 imposed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *