1 | | - | By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 728 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | April 26, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Education; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 728 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the establishment by the State Board of Education of an |
---|
12 | 6 | | advanced computer science program for high school students. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is |
---|
15 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 28.018 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 10 | | Sec. 28.018. ADVANCED COMPUTER SCIENCE PROGRAM. (a) The |
---|
17 | 11 | | State Board of Education by rule shall develop and implement a |
---|
18 | 12 | | program under which: |
---|
19 | 13 | | (1) students in participating school districts may |
---|
20 | 14 | | comply with the curriculum requirements for an advanced mathematics |
---|
21 | 15 | | credit under Section 28.025(b-1)(2) or an advanced science credit |
---|
22 | 16 | | under Section 28.025(b-1)(3) by successfully completing an |
---|
23 | 17 | | advanced computer science course; and |
---|
24 | 18 | | (2) participating school districts implement rigorous |
---|
25 | 19 | | standards, as developed by the State Board of Education, for |
---|
26 | 20 | | advanced computer science courses that are focused on the creation |
---|
27 | 21 | | and use of software and computing technologies. |
---|
28 | 22 | | (b) The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to |
---|
29 | 23 | | administer this section. |
---|
30 | 24 | | SECTION 2. The State Board of Education shall establish the |
---|
31 | 25 | | program under Section 28.018, Education Code, as added by this Act, |
---|
32 | 26 | | not later than September 1, 2018, for implementation during the |
---|
33 | 27 | | 2018-2019 school year. |
---|
34 | 28 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
35 | 29 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
36 | 30 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
37 | 31 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
38 | 32 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
39 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 33 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 35 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 728 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 36 | + | 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
| 37 | + | voting. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 40 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 728 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 41 | + | 15, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 42 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 44 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Date |
---|
| 46 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 47 | + | Governor |
---|