Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB728 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 728
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 April 26, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment by the State Board of Education of an
 advanced computer science program for high school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.018 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.018.  ADVANCED COMPUTER SCIENCE PROGRAM. (a)  The
 State Board of Education by rule shall develop and implement a
 program under which:
 (1)  students in participating school districts may
 comply with the curriculum requirements for an advanced mathematics
 credit under Section 28.025(b-1)(2) or an advanced science credit
 under Section 28.025(b-1)(3) by successfully completing an
 advanced computer science course; and
 (2)  participating school districts implement rigorous
 standards, as developed by the State Board of Education, for
 advanced computer science courses that are focused on the creation
 and use of software and computing technologies.
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 administer this section.
 SECTION 2.  The State Board of Education shall establish the
 program under Section 28.018, Education Code, as added by this Act,
 not later than September 1, 2018, for implementation during the
 2018-2019 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *