Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3268 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1163 | Journal Page: 3267 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3224 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1138 | Journal Page: 3223 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3223 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3223 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 455 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 455 | |
House | 01/09/2017 | Filed |