Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB884 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R2493 CAE-D
 By: King of Hemphill H.B. No. 884


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a revision of the essential knowledge and skills of the
 public school foundation curriculum and proclamations for the
 production of instructional materials.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0025.  REVIEW AND REVISION OF ESSENTIAL KNOWLEDGE
 AND SKILLS. (a) The State Board of Education shall:
 (1)  conduct a review of the essential knowledge and
 skills for the foundation curriculum adopted under Section
 28.002(a)(1); and
 (2)  revise the essential knowledge and skills for that
 curriculum to narrow the number and scope of student expectations
 for each subject and grade level in accordance with this section.
 (b)  The scope of the essential knowledge and skills for each
 subject and grade level of the foundation curriculum must:
 (1)  be more narrow than the scope of the essential
 knowledge and skills adopted as of January 1, 2017; and
 (2)  require less time for a demonstration of mastery
 than required for the essential knowledge and skills adopted as of
 January 1, 2017.
 (c)  In complying with this section, the State Board of
 Education shall:
 (1)  ensure that a revision of the essential knowledge
 and skills for the foundation curriculum does not result in a need
 for the adoption of new instructional materials;
 (2)  consider for each subject and grade level, the
 time:
 (A)  a teacher would require to provide
 comprehensive instruction on a particular student expectation; and
 (B)  a typical student would require to master a
 particular student expectation;
 (3)  determine whether, in light of the consideration
 required by Subdivision (2), each essential knowledge and skill of
 a subject can be comprehensively taught within the instruction time
 required under Section 25.081, not including the amount of time
 required for testing;
 (4)  determine whether the college and career readiness
 standards have been appropriately integrated in the essential
 knowledge and skills for each subject and grade level; and
 (5)  consider whether an assessment instrument
 administered under Section 39.023 adequately assesses a particular
 student expectation.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the State Board of
 Education shall complete the review and revision of the essential
 knowledge and skills for each subject and grade level of the
 foundation curriculum that was last revised before September 1,
 2014.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-b) to read as follows:
 (1-b)  "Proclamation" means a request for production of
 instructional materials issued by the State Board of Education.
 SECTION 3.  Section 31.022, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) and amending Subsection
 (f) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  For any state fiscal biennium, the board may only
 issue proclamations for instructional materials in which the total
 projected cost of instructional materials under the proclamations
 does not exceed 75 percent of the total amount used to fund the
 instructional materials allotment under Section 31.0211 for that
 biennium.
 (b-2)  Following the adoption of revised essential knowledge
 and skills for any subject, the board shall determine whether
 issuance of a proclamation is necessary based on the significance
 of the changes to the essential knowledge and skills. If the board
 determines a proclamation is necessary, the board shall issue:
 (1)  a full call for instructional materials aligned to
 all of the essential knowledge and skills for the subject and grade
 level;
 (2)  a supplemental call for instructional materials
 aligned to new or expanded essential knowledge and skills for the
 subject and grade level;
 (3)  a call for new information demonstrating alignment
 of current instructional materials to the revised essential
 knowledge and skills; or
 (4)  any combination of the calls described by
 Subdivisions (1), (2), and (3).
 (b-3)  In determining the disbursement of money to the
 available school fund and the amount of that disbursement that will
 be used, in accordance with Section 43.001(d), to fund the
 instructional materials allotment under Section 31.0211, the board
 must consider the cost of all instructional materials and
 technology requirements for that state fiscal biennium.
 (f)  The board shall amend any proclamation [request for
 production] issued for the purchase of instructional materials to
 conform to the instructional materials funding levels provided by
 the General Appropriations Act for the year of implementation and
 to comply with Subsection (b-1).
 SECTION 4.  Sections 31.101(d) and (e), Education Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.