Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1296
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#393
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Uresti
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1792
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#374
|
Journal Page: 1792
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Motion to table fails
|
1-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 1792
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2017
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 303
|
House
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 303
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|