E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3862
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1400
|
Journal Page: 3862
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3862
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3489
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#723
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 324
|
House
|
01/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|