Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 5, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2017
Bill April 28, 2017