LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HCR42
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HCR42
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR42
Compare Versions
HCR42 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HCR42 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HCR42 Enrolled May 20, 2017
HCR42 Comm Sub May 10, 2017
HCR42 Engrossed May 5, 2017
HCR42 Comm Sub April 28, 2017
HCR42 Introduced January 2, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HCR42 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HCR42 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HCR42 Enrolled May 20, 2017
HCR42 Comm Sub May 10, 2017
HCR42 Engrossed May 5, 2017
HCR42 Comm Sub April 28, 2017
HCR42 Introduced January 2, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare