E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4366 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4002 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1951 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1369 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#508 | Journal Page: 2060 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 2060 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amended | 1-Shine | Journal Page: 2059 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1089 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 01/31/2017 | Filed |