Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR56 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017