Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR56 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Shine, et al. H.C.R. No. 56
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Purple Heart is a combat decoration awarded to
 members of the United States armed forces who are wounded by an
 instrument of war in the hands of the enemy or presented to the next
 of kin in the name of those who are killed in action or die of wounds
 received in action; and
 WHEREAS, Originally established by General George Washington
 during the Revolutionary War, the Purple Heart was revived by means
 of a presidential executive order on February 22, 1932, the 200th
 anniversary of President Washington's birth, out of respect for his
 military achievements; the criteria were announced by the War
 Department on that date in General Order No. 3; and
 WHEREAS, Texas is home to 1.5 million veterans, representing
 5 percent of the nation's total veteran population; the state has 30
 Purple Heart cities, 4 Purple Heart counties, and 9 Purple Heart
 universities, which have all committed to recognizing veterans and
 honoring their commitments to veterans services; in addition, Texas
 is home to Belton New Tech High at Waskow, the first high school in
 the nation to earn a Purple Heart School designation, and to Purple
 Heart Elementary School in El Paso; and
 WHEREAS, Numerous Texas agencies provide services to benefit
 former members of the military, including the Texas Veterans
 Commission, Texas Veterans' Land Board, Office of the Adjutant
 General, Texas Health and Human Services Commission, State Bar of
 Texas, Department of State Health Services, Texas Workforce
 Commission, Texas Workforce Investment Council, Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board, Texas Correctional Office on
 Offenders with Medical or Mental Impairments, Texas Commission on
 Jail Standards, Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs,
 and Texas Department of Agriculture; and
 WHEREAS, The State of Texas is dedicated to improving the
 lives of its veterans with the highest standard of services, and it
 acknowledges the enormous sacrifices made by recipients of the
 Purple Heart; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby recognize Texas as a Purple Heart State and encourage
 agencies and government bodies at all levels to serve veterans with
 the same degree of devotion demonstrated by members of the armed
 forces in their service to our state and nation; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the Texas Legislature hereby designate
 February 22 as Purple Heart Day; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That, in accordance with the provisions of Section
 391.004(d), Government Code, this designation remain in effect
 until the 10th anniversary of the date this resolution is finally
 passed by the legislature.
 * * * * *