Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|