Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR10 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.J.R. No. 10
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2017;
3- May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4- Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+By: Smithee H.J.R. No. 10
72
83
9- HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
4+ A JOINT RESOLUTION
105 proposing a constitutional amendment changing the eligibility
116 requirements for certain judicial offices.
127 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
138 SECTION 1. Section 2(b), Article V, Texas Constitution, is
149 amended to read as follows:
1510 (b) No person shall be eligible to serve in the office of
1611 Chief Justice or Justice of the Supreme Court unless the person is
1712 licensed to practice law in the State of Texas [this state] and is,
1813 at the time of election, a citizen of the United States and of the
1914 State of Texas [this state], and has attained the age of thirty-five
2015 years, and has been a practicing lawyer licensed in the State of
2116 Texas for at least ten years, or has been a practicing lawyer
2217 licensed in the State of Texas and judge of a state court or county
2318 court established by the Legislature by statute for a combined
2419 total of [court of record together] at least ten years, during which
2520 time the person's license to practice law has not been revoked,
2621 suspended, or subject to a probated suspension.
2722 SECTION 2. Section 7, Article V, Texas Constitution, is
2823 amended to read as follows:
2924 Sec. 7. The State shall be divided into judicial districts,
3025 with each district having one or more Judges as may be provided by
3126 law or by this Constitution. Each district judge shall be elected
3227 by the qualified voters at a General Election and shall be a citizen
3328 of the United States and of this State, who is licensed to practice
3429 law in this State and has been a practicing lawyer or a Judge of a
3530 Court in this State, or both combined, for six [four (4)] years next
3631 preceding the judge's [his] election, during which time the judge's
3732 license to practice law has not been revoked, suspended, or subject
3833 to a probated suspension, who has resided in the district in which
3934 the judge [he] was elected for two [(2)] years next preceding the
4035 [his] election, and who shall reside in the [his] district during
4136 the judge's [his] term of office and hold the [his] office for the
4237 period of four [(4)] years, and who shall receive for the judge's
4338 [his] services an annual salary to be fixed by the Legislature. The
4439 Court shall conduct its proceedings at the county seat of the county
4540 in which the case is pending, except as otherwise provided by law.
4641 The judge [He] shall hold the regular terms of the judge's [his]
4742 Court at the County Seat of each County in the [his] district in
4843 such manner as may be prescribed by law. The Legislature shall have
4944 power by General or Special Laws to make such provisions concerning
5045 the terms or sessions of each Court as it may deem necessary.
5146 The Legislature shall also provide for the holding of
5247 District Court when the Judge thereof is absent, or is from any
5348 cause disabled or disqualified from presiding.
5449 SECTION 3. The following temporary provision is added to
5550 the Texas Constitution:
5651 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
5752 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
5853 Regular Session, 2017, changing the eligibility requirements for a
5954 justice of the supreme court, a judge of the court of criminal
6055 appeals, a justice of a court of appeals, and a district judge.
6156 (b) The amendment to Section 2(b), Article V, of this
6257 constitution takes effect January 1, 2018, and applies only to a
6358 chief justice or other justice of the supreme court, a presiding
6459 judge or other judge of the court of criminal appeals, or a chief
6560 justice or other justice of a court of appeals who is first elected
6661 for a term that begins on or after January 1, 2021, or who is
6762 appointed on or after that date.
6863 (c) The amendment to Section 7, Article V, of this
6964 constitution takes effect January 1, 2018, and applies only to a
7065 district judge who is first elected for a term that begins on or
7166 after January 1, 2021, or who is appointed on or after that date.
7267 (d) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2022.
7368 SECTION 4. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
7469 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
7570 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
7671 proposition: "The constitutional amendment changing the
7772 eligibility requirements for a justice of the supreme court, a
7873 judge of the court of criminal appeals, a justice of a court of
7974 appeals, and a district judge."
80- * * * * *