E | 05/23/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
E | 05/17/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3663 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2038 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3462 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Record vote | RV#1252 | Journal Page: 3462 |
House | 05/15/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3462 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3461 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3439 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3439 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3370 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1198 | Journal Page: 3369 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Postponed | 5/12/17 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3369 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3369 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2988 | Journal Page: 3369 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3155 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1682 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1682 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |