House | 05/19/2017 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3237 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1903 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1805 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Taylor of Collin | Journal Page: 1804 |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1804 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1804 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |