Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1061 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 1061
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; May 3, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1061 By:  Taylor of Collin


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the commissioner of education
 regarding granting additional charters for open-enrollment charter
 schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 12.1015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.1015.  ADDITIONAL CHARTER FOR OPEN-ENROLLMENT
 CHARTER SCHOOLS ALLOWED.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section
 12.101(b-3), the commissioner may grant more than one charter for
 an open-enrollment charter school to a charter holder if the
 additional charter is for an open-enrollment charter school that
 has a distinct purpose or student population.
 (b)  The commissioner by rule shall identify various types of
 open-enrollment charter schools to be used to determine if an
 open-enrollment charter school has a distinct purpose or will serve
 a different student population for purposes of this section.  The
 commissioner may award a charter under Subsection (a) if the
 commissioner determines the charter will serve a distinct purpose
 or student population regardless of whether the type of school for
 which the charter is sought has been identified by the
 commissioner.
 (c)  The rules adopted under Subsection (b) must account for
 the following types of open-enrollment charter schools:
 (1)  an open-enrollment charter school that serves a
 general student population through a distinctly different
 educational model;
 (2)  an alternative education open-enrollment charter
 school that serves students who:
 (A)  have dropped out of school; or
 (B)  are students at risk of dropping out of
 school, as defined by Section 29.081;
 (3)  an open-enrollment charter school operating under
 a charter granted under Section 12.1014;
 (4)  a virtual open-enrollment charter school; and
 (5)  any other open-enrollment charter school that
 serves a distinct student population, as determined by commissioner
 rule.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *