Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 526 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |