Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1362 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1362
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notification and informational materials regarding
 mutual consent voluntary adoption registries.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  This Act shall be known as the Mothers'
 Privacy Protection Act.
 (b)  It is the intent of the legislature that parties to an
 adoption be informed of all future contact options and resources,
 while respecting and protecting the decisions of parties to allow
 or not allow contact.
 SECTION 2.  Section 162.403, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  The vital statistics unit shall develop informational
 materials for birth parents and adoptive parents regarding the
 central registry and the other registries established under
 Subsection (b). The unit shall make the informational materials
 readily available on the Internet website of the Department of
 State Health Services.
 (e)  An authorized agency shall:
 (1)  notify in writing the birth parents and adoptive
 parents of a child for whom the authorized agency is providing
 adoption services of the existence of:
 (A)  the central registry; and
 (B)  any registry established by the authorized
 agency or by another authorized agency or an association of those
 agencies with whom the authorized agency contracts to perform
 registry services on its behalf, as applicable; and
 (2)  provide the birth parents and adoptive parents
 with the informational materials described by Subsection (d).
 SECTION 3.  The vital statistics unit of the Department of
 State Health Services shall make available on its Internet website
 the informational materials required by Section 162.403(d), Family
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  Section 162.403(e), Family Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with a child for whom an authorized
 agency is providing adoption services on or after January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *