1 | 1 | | By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1362 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2017; March 16, 2017, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to notification and informational materials regarding |
---|
12 | 12 | | mutual consent voluntary adoption registries. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. (a) This Act shall be known as the Mothers' |
---|
15 | 15 | | Privacy Protection Act. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) It is the intent of the legislature that parties to an |
---|
17 | 17 | | adoption be informed of all future contact options and resources, |
---|
18 | 18 | | while respecting and protecting the decisions of parties to allow |
---|
19 | 19 | | or not allow contact. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 162.403, Family Code, is amended by |
---|
21 | 21 | | adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (d) The vital statistics unit shall develop informational |
---|
23 | 23 | | materials for birth parents and adoptive parents regarding the |
---|
24 | 24 | | central registry and the other registries established under |
---|
25 | 25 | | Subsection (b). The unit shall make the informational materials |
---|
26 | 26 | | readily available on the Internet website of the Department of |
---|
27 | 27 | | State Health Services. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (e) An authorized agency shall: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) notify in writing the birth parents and adoptive |
---|
30 | 30 | | parents of a child for whom the authorized agency is providing |
---|
31 | 31 | | adoption services of the existence of: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (A) the central registry; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (B) any registry established by the authorized |
---|
34 | 34 | | agency or by another authorized agency or an association of those |
---|
35 | 35 | | agencies with whom the authorized agency contracts to perform |
---|
36 | 36 | | registry services on its behalf, as applicable; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) provide the birth parents and adoptive parents |
---|
38 | 38 | | with the informational materials described by Subsection (d). |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 3. The vital statistics unit of the Department of |
---|
40 | 40 | | State Health Services shall make available on its Internet website |
---|
41 | 41 | | the informational materials required by Section 162.403(d), Family |
---|
42 | 42 | | Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2018. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 4. Section 162.403(e), Family Code, as added by |
---|
44 | 44 | | this Act, applies beginning with a child for whom an authorized |
---|
45 | 45 | | agency is providing adoption services on or after January 1, 2018. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
47 | 47 | | * * * * * |
---|