Senate | 05/09/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |