1 | 1 | | By: Creighton S.B. No. 1441 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 3; April 10, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment |
---|
12 | 12 | | or order on appeal. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 22.004, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | adding Subsection (i) to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (i) The supreme court shall adopt rules to provide that the |
---|
17 | 17 | | right of an appellant under Section 6.001(b)(1), (2), or (3), Civil |
---|
18 | 18 | | Practice and Remedies Code, to supersede a judgment or order on |
---|
19 | 19 | | appeal is not subject to being counter-superseded under Rule |
---|
20 | 20 | | 24.2(a)(3), Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure, or any other rule. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. The Texas Supreme Court shall adopt the rules |
---|
22 | 22 | | required by Section 22.004(i), Government Code, as added by this |
---|
23 | 23 | | Act, before May 1, 2018. |
---|
24 | 24 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
25 | 25 | | * * * * * |
---|